NY A02770 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-22 - approval memo.52
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-22 - approval memo.52
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the Jonah Bichotte Cowan Law; relates to pre-term labor care and directs the commissioner of health to require hospitals to provide pre-term labor patients with information regarding the potential health effects of pre-term labor and pre-term delivery on an expectant mother and on her fetus.
Title
Enacts the Jonah Bichotte Cowan Law; relates to pre-term labor care and directs the commissioner of health to require hospitals to provide pre-term labor patients with information regarding the potential health effects of pre-term labor and pre-term delivery on an expectant mother and on her fetus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-22 | Senate | approval memo.52 |
2020-12-22 | Senate | signed chap.348 |
2020-12-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-23 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-23 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.911 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8525 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.155 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.155 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | print number 2770c |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2020-04-15 | Assembly | print number 2770b |
2020-04-15 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | print number 2770a |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2019-01-25 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S08525 (Same As) 2020-12-22 - approval memo.52