NY A02758 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Creates a public education initiative designed to eliminate stigma and misinformation about mental illness and substance use among military service members.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates a public education initiative designed to eliminate stigma and misinformation about mental illness and substance use among military service members.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-14Senate3RD READING CAL.1379
2019-06-14SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S3200A
2019-06-04SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-04Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-04Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-30Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.491
2019-05-30Assemblyreported
2019-05-13Assemblyprint number 2758a
2019-05-13Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to ways and means
2019-04-30Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-01-25Assemblyreferred to mental health

Same As/Similar To

S03200 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2758A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02758&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02758&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02758
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02758&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02758A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02758&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02758&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02758&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A2758#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback