NY A02750 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-13 - approval memo.33
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes that in a FOIL proceeding, the court shall assess against an agency reasonable attorney's fees and other litigation costs incurred when a person substantially prevails unless the court finds otherwise.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes that in a FOIL proceeding, the court shall assess against an agency reasonable attorney's fees and other litigation costs incurred when a person substantially prevails unless the court finds otherwise.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-13Senateapproval memo.33
2017-12-13Senatesigned chap.453
2017-12-06Assemblydelivered to governor
2017-06-05SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-05SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-05Senate3RD READING CAL.640
2017-06-05SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2392A
2017-05-01SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2017-05-01Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-05-01Assemblypassed assembly
2017-04-27Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.191
2017-04-25Assemblyreported
2017-03-13Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2017-03-07Assemblyreported referred to codes
2017-03-02Assemblyprint number 2750a
2017-03-02Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to governmental operations
2017-01-23Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S02392 (Same As) 2017-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2750A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02750&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02750&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02750
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02750&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02750A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02750&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02750&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02750&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02750&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A2750#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback