NY A02750 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-05 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes creation of a state debt for payment of a bonus to members of the armed forces from this state for service during the period of the Korean, Vietnam or Persian Gulf hostilities of a maximum of $400 for overseas service and $300 for stateside service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes creation of a state debt for payment of a bonus to members of the armed forces from this state for service during the period of the Korean, Vietnam or Persian Gulf hostilities of a maximum of $400 for overseas service and $300 for stateside service.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-05Assemblyopinion referred to judiciary
2016-01-13Assemblyto attorney-general for opinion
2016-01-06Assemblyreferred to veterans' affairs
2015-02-09Assemblyopinion referred to judiciary
2015-01-23Assemblyto attorney-general for opinion
2015-01-20Assemblyreferred to veterans' affairs

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback