NY A02750 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-13 - advanced to third reading cal.851
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

To permit racetracks and other racing event producers or retailers to band together to establish agreements governing the scheduling of their races and to establish joint agreements involving the sale and purchase of broadcasting and simulcasting rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act to amend the racing, pari-mutuel wagering and breeding law, in relation to antitrust exemptions for horse racing agreements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-13 advanced to third reading cal.851
2010-05-12 reported
2010-01-06 referred to racing and wagering
2009-06-03 reported referred to rules
2009-01-21 referred to racing and wagering

Same As/Similar To

S6197 (Same As) 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback