NY A02745 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-29 - print number 2745a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-29 - print number 2745a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a new class D violent felony offense of endangering the welfare of a child in the first degree; converts the current offense of endangering the welfare of a child to a second degree crime.
Title
Creates a new class D violent felony offense of endangering the welfare of a child in the first degree; converts the current offense of endangering the welfare of a child to a second degree crime.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-29 | Assembly | print number 2745a |
2016-01-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2015-01-20 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S03362 (Same As) 2016-03-15 - referred to codes