NY A02729 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - advanced to third reading cal.556
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - advanced to third reading cal.556
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides superintendent of insurance shall establish standards for hurricane windstorm deductibles, creating uniformity in the operation of such deductibles with respect to the triggering event.
Title
Provides superintendent of insurance shall establish standards for hurricane windstorm deductibles, creating uniformity in the operation of such deductibles with respect to the triggering event.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.556 |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | reported |
2014-01-22 | Assembly | committed to insurance |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.157 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.247 |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | reported |
2013-01-17 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S02032 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE