NY A02727 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires sunscreen products to be labeled with best if used before dates; authorizes the attorney general to seek injunctive relief, restitution, and civil penalties in the case of violations; authorizes persons injured by a violation of this law to bring an action for injunctive relief and actual damages or two hundred and fifty dollars, whichever is greater.
Title
Requires sunscreen products to be labeled with best if used before dates; authorizes the attorney general to seek injunctive relief, restitution, and civil penalties in the case of violations; authorizes persons injured by a violation of this law to bring an action for injunctive relief and actual damages or two hundred and fifty dollars, whichever is greater.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Senate | tabled |
2014-12-17 | Senate | vetoed memo.531 |
2014-12-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1609 |
2014-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6403B |
2014-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-06-19 | Senate | returned to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 2727b |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-16 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2014-02-10 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2014-02-10 | Senate | returned to senate |
2014-02-10 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2014-02-03 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 2727a |
2014-02-03 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2014-02-03 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-02-03 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2014-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2014-01-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-01-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.156 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-03-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2013-03-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-03-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-03-01 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.65 |
2013-02-27 | Assembly | reported |
2013-02-11 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-01-17 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S05645 (Same As) 2013-05-31 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
S06403 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2727B
S06403 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2727B