NY A02688 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - signed chap.373
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to solicitation used by or on behalf of any charitable organization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to solicitation used by or on behalf of any charitable organization.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21Senatesigned chap.373
2018-12-11Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.1099
2018-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S3780B
2018-03-19SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2018-03-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-03-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-03-14Assemblyamended on third reading 2688b
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.214
2018-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2017-06-20SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2017-06-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.472
2017-06-19Assemblyrules report cal.472
2017-06-19Assemblyreported
2017-06-19Assemblyreported referred to rules
2017-06-15Assemblyreported referred to codes
2017-06-09Assemblyprint number 2688a
2017-06-09Assemblyamend and recommit to governmental operations
2017-01-20Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S03780 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2688B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02688&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02688&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02688
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02688&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02688A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02688&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02688B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02688&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02688&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02688&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02688&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A2688#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback