NY A02682 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the sale of cannabinoid hemp flower.
Title
Relates to the sale of cannabinoid hemp flower.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | print number 2682a |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-01-19 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S04340 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO HEALTH