NY A02681 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-2)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - approval memo.7
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prevents occupational exposure to an airborne infectious disease by implementing a model infectious disease exposure prevention standard and requiring employers to implement such model or a similar plan; provides that where an action brought by an employee under the provisions of this section, or a defense, counterclaim, or crossclaim brought by an employer in response thereto, is found upon judgment to be completely without merit in law and undertaken primarily to harass or maliciously injure another, the court may in its discretion impose sanctions against the attorney or party who brought such action, defense, counterclaim or crossclaim; makes related provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prevents occupational exposure to an airborne infectious disease by implementing a model infectious disease exposure prevention standard and requiring employers to implement such model or a similar plan; provides that where an action brought by an employee under the provisions of this section, or a defense, counterclaim, or crossclaim brought by an employer in response thereto, is found upon judgment to be completely without merit in law and undertaken primarily to harass or maliciously injure another, the court may in its discretion impose sanctions against the attorney or party who brought such action, defense, counterclaim or crossclaim; makes related provisions.

Sponsors

Asm. Karines Reyes [D]Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D]Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]
Asm. Nily Rozic [D]Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]Asm. Christopher Burdick [D]Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]
Asm. Charles Barron [D]Asm. Jose Rivera [D]Asm. Steven Englebright [D]Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D]
Asm. Alfred Taylor [D]Asm. Stefani Zinerman [D]Asm. Nick Perry [D]Asm. Demond Meeks [D]
Asm. Sarah Clark [D]Asm. Jennifer Lunsford [D]Asm. Jessica Gonzalez-Rojas [D]Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]
Asm. Zohran Kwame Mamdani [D]Asm. Jo Simon [D]Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]Asm. Inez Dickens [D]
Asm. Chantel Jackson [D]Asm. Emily Gallagher [D]Asm. Nathalia Fernandez [D]Asm. William Colton [D]
Asm. Jenifer Rajkumar [D]Asm. Harvey Epstein [D]Asm. Gina Sillitti [D]Asm. Daniel Rosenthal [D]
Asm. Robert Carroll [D]Asm. Marcela Mitaynes [D]Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D]Asm. Dan Quart [D]
Asm. Harry Bronson [D]Asm. Catherine Nolan [D]Asm. Phara Souffrant Forrest [D]Asm. Charles Lavine [D]
Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D]Asm. Michael Benedetto [D]Asm. Peter Abbate [D]Asm. Fred Thiele [D]
Asm. Khaleel Anderson [D]Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D]Asm. Brian Barnwell [D]Asm. Kenneth Burgos [D]
Asm. Catalina Cruz [D]Asm. Amanda Septimo [D]Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D]Asm. Victor Pichardo [D]
Asm. Michael Durso [R]Asm. Steven Cymbrowitz [D]Asm. Monica Wallace [D]Asm. Ron Kim [D]
Asm. Steven Otis [D]Asm. Pamela Hunter [D]Asm. Phillip Steck [D]Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte Hermelyn [D]
Asm. Deborah Glick [D]Asm. Maritza Davila [D]Asm. Philip Ramos [D]Asm. David McDonough [R]

Roll Calls

2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-05Assemblyapproval memo.7
2021-05-05Assemblysigned chap.105
2021-04-23Assemblydelivered to governor
2021-04-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-04-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-04-20Senate3RD READING CAL.119
2021-04-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S1034B
2021-04-19SenateREFERRED TO LABOR
2021-04-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2021-04-19Assemblypassed assembly
2021-04-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.61
2021-04-19Assemblyrules report cal.61
2021-04-19Assemblyreported
2021-04-19Assemblyreported referred to rules
2021-03-30Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2021-03-26Assemblyprint number 2681b
2021-03-26Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2021-03-16Assemblyreported referred to codes
2021-02-24Assemblyprint number 2681a
2021-02-24Assemblyamend and recommit to labor
2021-01-19Assemblyreferred to labor

Same As/Similar To

S01034 (Same As) 2021-04-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2681B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A2681
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02681&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02681
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02681&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02681A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02681&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02681B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02681&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02681&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02681&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC4
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02681&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02681&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A2681#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback