NY A02679 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - approval memo.67
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - approval memo.67
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of housing and community renewal to promulgate rules and regulations regarding the use of electronic records and signatures for residential leases and lease renewals of units for which the owner is required to file annual registration statements.
Title
Directs the commissioner of housing and community renewal to promulgate rules and regulations regarding the use of electronic records and signatures for residential leases and lease renewals of units for which the owner is required to file annual registration statements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-21 | Assembly | approval memo.67 |
2021-12-21 | Assembly | signed chap.677 |
2021-12-09 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-05-10 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-10 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.491 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4742 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2021-02-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-02-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.76 |
2021-01-26 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-19 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S04742 (Same As) 2021-05-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2679