NY A02678 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires drivers between 16 and 25 years of age to take and pass the national safety council course, or a similar nationally recognized course in order to obtain a license or upon conviction of a moving violation.
Title
Requires drivers between 16 and 25 years of age to take and pass the national safety council course, or a similar nationally recognized course in order to obtain a license or upon conviction of a moving violation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | print number 2678a |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2017-01-20 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S03503 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION