NY A02666 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - substituted by s13a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - substituted by s13a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "Scott J. Beigel unfinished receiver act"; relates to unfinished frames or receivers; establishes the crimes of criminal sale of an unfinished frame or receiver in the first and second degrees as class D and E felonies, respectively.
Title
Enacts the "Scott J. Beigel unfinished receiver act"; relates to unfinished frames or receivers; establishes the crimes of criminal sale of an unfinished frame or receiver in the first and second degrees as class D and E felonies, respectively.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Assembly | substituted by s13a |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.423 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | print number 2666a |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2021-01-19 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S00013 (Same As) 2021-10-28 - APPROVAL MEMO.27