NY A02665 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.263
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the right of tenants to call police or emergency assistance without fear of losing their housing as the result of landlord actions or local nuisance laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the right of tenants to call police or emergency assistance without fear of losing their housing as the result of landlord actions or local nuisance laws.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-13Senatesigned chap.263
2019-09-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-05-14SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-14Senate3RD READING CAL.587
2019-05-14SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4657A
2019-04-09SenateREFERRED TO CODES
2019-04-09Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-04-09Assemblypassed assembly
2019-04-09Assemblyruling of chair on point of order
2019-04-09Assemblyruling of chair on point of order
2019-04-09Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.57
2019-04-09Assemblyrules report cal.57
2019-04-09Assemblyreported
2019-04-09Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-04-05Assemblyprint number 2665a
2019-04-05Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2019-03-19Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-24Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S04657 (Same As) 2019-05-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2665A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02665&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02665&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02665
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02665&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02665A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02665&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02665&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02665&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02665&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A2665#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback