NY A02662 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-31 - amended on third reading 2662a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits police officers from using racial and ethnic profiling; requires that a procedure be established for the taking and review of complaints against police officers for racial and ethnic profiling; allows an action for injunctive relief and/or damages to be brought against a law enforcement agency, any agent of a law enforcement agency and the supervisor of an agent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits police officers from using racial and ethnic profiling; requires that a procedure be established for the taking and review of complaints against police officers for racial and ethnic profiling; allows an action for injunctive relief and/or damages to be brought against a law enforcement agency, any agent of a law enforcement agency and the supervisor of an agent.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-31Assemblyamended on third reading 2662a
2022-01-05Assemblyordered to third reading cal.112
2021-02-11Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.106
2021-02-09Assemblyreported
2021-01-19Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S00583 (Same As) 2021-01-06 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
S08121 (Same As) 2022-01-25 - REFERRED TO CODES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback