NY A02656 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-22 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Permits pregnant women to enroll in the state health insurance exchange at any time without penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits pregnant women to enroll in the state health insurance exchange at any time without penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-22SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-01-22SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-01-22Senate3RD READING CAL.95
2024-01-22SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S201
2024-01-22SenateREFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES
2024-01-22Assemblydelivered to senate
2024-01-22Assemblypassed assembly
2024-01-18Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.224
2024-01-17Assemblyreported
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to insurance
2023-01-26Assemblyreferred to insurance

Same As/Similar To

S00201 (Same As) 2024-01-22 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2656

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback