NY A02636 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for initiative; empowers the electors with the ability to propose statutes and amendments to the constitution.
Title
Provides for initiative; empowers the electors with the ability to propose statutes and amendments to the constitution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2019-02-13 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2019-01-30 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S01168 (Same As) 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY