NY A02622 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - substituted by s968a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - substituted by s968a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires service providers to annually submit an emergency response plan to the public service commission for review; authorizes the public service commission to require the service provider amend the plan; authorizes the commission to open an investigation to review the performance of service providers in meeting the requirements of the emergency response plan.
Title
Requires service providers to annually submit an emergency response plan to the public service commission for review; authorizes the public service commission to require the service provider amend the plan; authorizes the commission to open an investigation to review the performance of service providers in meeting the requirements of the emergency response plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Assembly | substituted by s968a |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | rules report cal.292 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | print number 2622a |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2021-01-19 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S00968 (Same As) 2022-12-09 - VETOED MEMO.92