NY A02622 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-18 - print number 2622a
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-18 - print number 2622a
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires insurance coverage under health insurance plans for diagnosis and treatment of craniofacial disorder; provides a referral from a health care provider under contract with the policy may be required.
Title
Requires insurance coverage under health insurance plans for diagnosis and treatment of craniofacial disorder; provides a referral from a health care provider under contract with the policy may be required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-18 | Assembly | print number 2622a |
2012-01-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2011-01-19 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S00139 (Same As) 2012-01-13 - PRINT NUMBER 139A