NY A02619 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-09 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-09 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to acknowledging the fundamental injustice, cruelty, brutality, and inhumanity of slavery in the city of New York and the state of New York; establishes the New York state community commission on reparations remedies to examine the institution of slavery, subsequently de jure and de facto racial and economic discrimination against African-Americans, the impact of these forces on living African-Americans and to make recommendations on appropriate remedies; provides for the repeal of such provisions.
Title
Relates to acknowledging the fundamental injustice, cruelty, brutality, and inhumanity of slavery in the city of New York and the state of New York; establishes the New York state community commission on reparations remedies to examine the institution of slavery, subsequently de jure and de facto racial and economic discrimination against African-Americans, the impact of these forces on living African-Americans and to make recommendations on appropriate remedies; provides for the repeal of such provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 103 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.539 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.539 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-04 | Assembly | print number 2619a |
2021-06-04 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-01-19 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S07215 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO FINANCE