NY A02611 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - print number 2611b
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the use of consumer credit history in hiring, employment and licensing determinations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the use of consumer credit history in hiring, employment and licensing determinations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20Assemblyprint number 2611b
2019-03-20Assemblyamend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection
2019-02-08Assemblyprint number 2611a
2019-02-08Assemblyamend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection
2019-01-24Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection

Same As/Similar To

S02884 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback