NY A02604 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-19)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - substituted by s5949a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - substituted by s5949a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes protocols for combative sports; authorizes mixed martial arts events in this state; establishes procedures for applications for licenses; establishes penalties for violations; imposes taxes on gross receipts of such events.
Title
Establishes protocols for combative sports; authorizes mixed martial arts events in this state; establishes procedures for applications for licenses; establishes penalties for violations; imposes taxes on gross receipts of such events.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Assembly | substituted by s5949a |
2016-03-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.5 |
2016-03-22 | Assembly | reported |
2016-03-22 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-03-22 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-03-22 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2015-06-14 | Assembly | print number 2604c |
2015-06-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2015-06-12 | Assembly | print number 2604b |
2015-06-12 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | print number 2604a |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2015-01-20 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S02159 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION
S05949 (Same As) 2016-04-14 - SIGNED CHAP.32
S05949 (Same As) 2016-04-14 - SIGNED CHAP.32