NY A02600 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the commissioner of the department of health to provide educational materials on the department's website concerning the state's public drinking water systems and to participate in the federal drinking water watch program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the commissioner of the department of health to provide educational materials on the department's website concerning the state's public drinking water systems and to participate in the federal drinking water watch program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-12SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2018-03-12Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-03-12Assemblypassed assembly
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.207
2018-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2017-06-15SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2017-06-15Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-06-15Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-15Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.325
2017-06-15Assemblyrules report cal.325
2017-06-15Assemblyreported
2017-06-12Assemblyreported referred to rules
2017-06-06Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2017-05-25Assemblyprint number 2600b
2017-05-25Assemblyamend and recommit to health
2017-05-08Assemblyprint number 2600a
2017-05-08Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to health
2017-01-20Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S02889 (Same As) 2018-05-31 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02600&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02600&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02600
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02600&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02600A
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02600&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02600B
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02600&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02600&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02600&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02600&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback