NY A02590 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - REFERRED TO AGING
Pending: Senate Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - REFERRED TO AGING
Pending: Senate Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to reporting unmet need, which is the number of eligible individuals seeking participation in a program or service who are not receiving such program or service due to insufficient resources or capacity.
Title
Relates to reporting unmet need, which is the number of eligible individuals seeking participation in a program or service who are not receiving such program or service due to insufficient resources or capacity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Aging Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Aging Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2022-01-26 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-01-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.111 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.754 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.754 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | print number 2590b |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | print number 2590a |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-01-19 | Assembly | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S08467 (Same As) 2022-03-24 - PRINT NUMBER 8467A