NY A02572 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to prohibiting state authorizations related to certain offshore oil and natural gas production.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to prohibiting state authorizations related to certain offshore oil and natural gas production.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 121 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-02-05SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-02-05Senate3RD READING CAL.76
2019-02-05SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2316
2019-02-04SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2019-02-04Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-02-04Assemblypassed assembly
2019-02-04Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.29
2019-02-04Assemblyrules report cal.29
2019-02-04Assemblyreported
2019-02-04Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-01-29Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-01-23Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S02316 (Same As) 2019-02-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2572

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02572&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02572&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02572
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02572&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02572&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02572&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02572&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A2572#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback