NY A02571 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the taking of menhaden; provides that menhaden (Brevoortia tyrannus) from which oil or meal is made may not be taken from the waters of the marine district with a purse seine unless the department determines there is an imminent risk of a fish kill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the taking of menhaden; provides that menhaden (Brevoortia tyrannus) from which oil or meal is made may not be taken from the waters of the marine district with a purse seine unless the department determines there is an imminent risk of a fish kill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-02-05SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-02-05Senate3RD READING CAL.77
2019-02-05SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2317
2019-02-04SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2019-02-04Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-02-04Assemblypassed assembly
2019-01-31Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.29
2019-01-29Assemblyreported
2019-01-23Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S02317 (Same As) 2019-02-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2571

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback