NY A02570 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - signed chap.17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the number of signatures for designating petitions for 2019; provides such shall be reduced by one-quarter, rounded down to the nearest whole number.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the number of signatures for designating petitions for 2019; provides such shall be reduced by one-quarter, rounded down to the nearest whole number.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-20Senatesigned chap.17
2019-02-19Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-02-12SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-02-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-02-12Senate3RD READING CAL.103
2019-02-12SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2862
2019-01-28SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS
2019-01-28Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-01-28Assemblypassed assembly
2019-01-28Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.19
2019-01-28Assemblyrules report cal.19
2019-01-28Assemblyreported
2019-01-28Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-01-23Assemblyreferred to election law

Same As/Similar To

S02862 (Same As) 2019-02-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2570

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02570&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02570&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02570
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02570&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02570&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02570&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A2570#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback