NY A02566 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - print number 2566b
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes an exemption for class one capital improvements to residential buildings and certain new construction in a special assessing unit that is not a city.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes an exemption for class one capital improvements to residential buildings and certain new construction in a special assessing unit that is not a city.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18Assemblyprint number 2566b
2021-03-18Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to real property taxation
2021-02-24Assemblyprint number 2566a
2021-02-24Assemblyamend and recommit to real property taxation
2021-01-19Assemblyreferred to real property taxation

Same As/Similar To

S04265 (Same As) 2021-03-17 - AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4265A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback