NY A02566 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Expands eligibility for those who receive awards under crime victims' compensation to include a domestic partner; defines domestic partner; further provides for out-of-pocket loss to include the cost of counseling for surviving family members of homicide victims.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expands eligibility for those who receive awards under crime victims' compensation to include a domestic partner; defines domestic partner; further provides for out-of-pocket loss to include the cost of counseling for surviving family members of homicide victims.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-14Senate3RD READING CAL.681
2019-05-14SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4958
2019-04-09SenateREFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
2019-04-09Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-04-09Assemblypassed assembly
2019-04-09Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.56
2019-04-09Assemblyrules report cal.56
2019-04-09Assemblyreported
2019-04-09Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-02-11Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-02-05Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-23Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S04958 (Same As) 2019-05-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2566

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02566&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02566&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02566
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02566&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02566&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02566&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC4
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02566&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02566&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A2566#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback