NY A02562 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the appointment of a member from the state's largest agricultural advocacy organization for agricultural representation on the state fire prevention and building code council.
Title
Provides for the appointment of a member from the state's largest agricultural advocacy organization for agricultural representation on the state fire prevention and building code council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.106 |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.106 |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-01-19 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S07115 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT