NY A02543 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - substituted by s4730
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - substituted by s4730
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the liability of a person who presents false claims for money or property to the state or a local government.
Title
Relates to the liability of a person who presents false claims for money or property to the state or a local government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Assembly | substituted by s4730 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.421 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.421 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-01-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S04730 (Same As) 2021-12-31 - VETOED MEMO.83