NY A02530 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - signed chap.557
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - signed chap.557
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a commission on prison education to study and develop a plan for improving education in state prisons.
Title
Establishes a commission on prison education to study and develop a plan for improving education in state prisons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-03 | Assembly | signed chap.557 |
2021-10-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-10 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.988 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5468 |
2021-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.167 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.167 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-01-19 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S05468 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2530