NY A02529 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - print number 2529a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - print number 2529a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the powers of a social services official to receive and dispose of a deed, mortgage or lien.
Title
Relates to the powers of a social services official to receive and dispose of a deed, mortgage or lien.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Assembly | print number 2529a |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-01-19 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S00787 (Same As) 2022-01-07 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN