NY A02527 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.200
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.200
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates, in addition to the existing sanction of criminal contempt of court, the remedies of labor law civil penalties and employee's right to bring civil action for unlawful discharge, penalty or discrimination on account of the exercise by an employee of a juror's right to be absent from employment by reason of jury service.
Title
Creates, in addition to the existing sanction of criminal contempt of court, the remedies of labor law civil penalties and employee's right to bring civil action for unlawful discharge, penalty or discrimination on account of the exercise by an employee of a juror's right to be absent from employment by reason of jury service.
Sponsors
Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. Michael Miller [D] | Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] |
Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Barbara Lifton [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.200 |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.392 |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-20 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |