NY A02525 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Expands the age range eligibility for the rent subsidy payable to a foster child living independently to age twenty-four.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expands the age range eligibility for the rent subsidy payable to a foster child living independently to age twenty-four.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2023-05-16Assemblyprint number 2525c
2023-05-16Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2023-05-15Assemblyprint number 2525b
2023-05-15Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to ways and means
2023-02-07Assemblyprint number 2525a
2023-02-07Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to ways and means
2023-02-07Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2023-01-26Assemblyreferred to children and families

Same As/Similar To

S02038 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A2525
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02525&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02525
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02525&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02525A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02525&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02525B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02525&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02525C
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02525&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1

Bill Comments

feedback