NY A02520 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - substituted by s1789
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - substituted by s1789
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes that domestic violence advocates may not disclose any communication made by a client to the advocate except in certain circumstances including after the consent of the client or if the client reveals an intent to commit a crime.
Title
Establishes that domestic violence advocates may not disclose any communication made by a client to the advocate except in certain circumstances including after the consent of the client or if the client reveals an intent to commit a crime.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | Assembly | substituted by s1789 |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | rules report cal.103 |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-01-19 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S01789 (Same As) 2021-07-23 - SIGNED CHAP.309