NY A02505 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - signed chap.556
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - signed chap.556
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits contracts for the purchase or lease of consumer goods from restricting venue in an action relating to such contract.
Title
Prohibits contracts for the purchase or lease of consumer goods from restricting venue in an action relating to such contract.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 107 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 107 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-03 | Assembly | signed chap.556 |
2021-10-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-10 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.838 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S997 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-02-11 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.104 |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-26 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-01-19 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S00997 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2505