NY A02500 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-16 - signed chap.225
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-16 - signed chap.225
Summary
Gives the attorney general explicit authority to take proof, determine facts, and issue subpoenas pursuant to civil practice law and rules, in proceedings to compel compliance with title 1 of article 7 of the general obligations law relating to money held in trust in certain cases; requires money deposited as security to be held in trust in certain rental cases; authorizes court to award attorney general costs of investigation for maximum of $2,000 with respect to each named respondent.
Title
Gives the attorney general explicit authority to take proof, determine facts, and issue subpoenas pursuant to civil practice law and rules, in proceedings to compel compliance with title 1 of article 7 of the general obligations law relating to money held in trust in certain cases; requires money deposited as security to be held in trust in certain rental cases; authorizes court to award attorney general costs of investigation for maximum of $2,000 with respect to each named respondent.
Sponsors
Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D] | Asm. James Brennan [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Earlene Hooper [D] |
Asm. Gary Pretlow [D] | Asm. Anthony Seminerio [D] | Asm. Helene Weinstein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-16 | signed chap.225 | |
2009-07-10 | delivered to governor | |
2009-06-03 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-06-03 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-05-26 | 3RD READING CAL.387 | |
2009-05-26 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2461 | |
2009-04-27 | REFERRED TO CODES | |
2009-04-27 | delivered to senate | |
2009-04-27 | passed assembly | |
2009-04-23 | advanced to third reading cal.368 | |
2009-04-20 | reported | |
2009-01-16 | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S02461 (Same As) 2009-07-16 - signed chap.225
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02500&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |