NY A02499 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - amended on third reading 2499a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires signatures of all owners of leased premises for a lease of oil, gas or mineral rights, and for any modification, renewal or extension thereof.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires signatures of all owners of leased premises for a lease of oil, gas or mineral rights, and for any modification, renewal or extension thereof.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-27Assemblyamended on third reading 2499a
2018-02-15Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.672
2018-02-13Assemblyreported
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to judiciary
2017-01-20Assemblyreferred to judiciary

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback