NY A02483 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-16 - signed chap.139
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-16 - signed chap.139
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes the state and all public employers as employers subject to the provisions of the human rights law; includes executive, legislative and judicial employers.
Title
Includes the state and all public employers as employers subject to the provisions of the human rights law; includes executive, legislative and judicial employers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Assembly | signed chap.139 |
2022-03-15 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-03-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-03-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-03-01 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.386 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3395A |
2022-02-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2022-02-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-02-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.424 |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | reported |
2022-02-01 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | print number 2483b |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2021-02-05 | Assembly | print number 2483a |
2021-02-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2021-01-19 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S03395 (Same As) 2022-03-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2483B