NY A02483 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the establishment of an inmate visitation program, which gives inmates opportunities for personal contact with relatives, friends, clergy, volunteers and other persons to promote better institutional adjustment and better community adjustment upon release.
Title
Relates to the establishment of an inmate visitation program, which gives inmates opportunities for personal contact with relatives, friends, clergy, volunteers and other persons to promote better institutional adjustment and better community adjustment upon release.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Senate | died in assembly |
2019-05-30 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.393 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | substituted for a2483 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-13 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.241 |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.109 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | substituted by s2698 |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.393 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S02698 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION