NY A02481 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-12 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to allowing two automatic free transfers for riders using pay-per-ride Metrocards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to allowing two automatic free transfers for riders using pay-per-ride Metrocards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-12Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-02-07Assemblyprint number 2481a
2019-02-07Assemblyamend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions
2019-01-22Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions

Same As/Similar To

S02779 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - referred to ways and means

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback