NY A02479 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits an employer from requesting or requiring that an employee or applicant disclose any user name, password, or other means for accessing a personal account or service through specified electronic communications devices.
Title
Prohibits an employer from requesting or requiring that an employee or applicant disclose any user name, password, or other means for accessing a personal account or service through specified electronic communications devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 120 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.108 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.247 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.247 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | print number 2479a |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to labor |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S05544 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO LABOR