NY A02478 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-14 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-14 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to assisting persons with medically diagnosed HIV infection.
Title
Relates to assisting persons with medically diagnosed HIV infection.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-14 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to social services |
2021-01-19 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S01073 (Same As) 2022-05-19 - PRINT NUMBER 1073A