NY A02477 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-1)
Status: Vetoed on December 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-10 - VETOED MEMO.193
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-10 - VETOED MEMO.193
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prohibiting the use of chlorpyrifos by aerial application by January 1, 2020; prohibits all use except for apple tree trunks by January 1, 2021 and prohibits any use of chlorpyrifos by December 1, 2021.
Title
Relates to prohibiting the use of chlorpyrifos by aerial application by January 1, 2020; prohibits all use except for apple tree trunks by January 1, 2021 and prohibits any use of chlorpyrifos by December 1, 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-10 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.193 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-04-30 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-04-30 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-04-30 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.186 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | substituted for a2477b |
2019-04-30 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.490 |
2019-04-26 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | substituted by s5343 |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | amended on third reading 2477b |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.186 |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | print number 2477a |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S02156 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
S05343 (Same As) 2019-12-10 - VETOED MEMO.193
S05343 (Same As) 2019-12-10 - VETOED MEMO.193