NY A02462 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the care and treatment of injured employees by licensed or certified acupuncturists under the workers' compensation program.
Title
Authorizes the care and treatment of injured employees by licensed or certified acupuncturists under the workers' compensation program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-30 | Senate | tabled |
2016-09-29 | Senate | vetoed memo.212 |
2016-09-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1909 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7431A |
2016-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | amended on third reading 2462a |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.118 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.118 |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.217 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.217 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-01-16 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S07431 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2462A