NY A02455 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.215
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.215
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to conciliation and non-compliance with public assistance employment.
Title
Relates to conciliation and non-compliance with public assistance employment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.215 |
2019-12-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-05 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-05 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-05 | Senate | ruling of chair on point of order |
2019-06-05 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.391 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | substituted for a2455a |
2019-06-04 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.607 |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 3840A |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | substituted by s3840a |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.391 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-04-18 | Assembly | print number 2455a |
2019-04-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to social services |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S03840 (Same As) 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.215