NY A02439 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-15 - approval memo.41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-15 - approval memo.41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the president of the state civil service commission to publish reports annually relating to diversity within state government.
Title
Directs the president of the state civil service commission to publish reports annually relating to diversity within state government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-15 | Assembly | approval memo.41 |
2021-11-15 | Assembly | signed chap.615 |
2021-11-03 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-01 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1339 |
2021-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4746 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.352 |
2021-05-11 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-01-19 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S04746 (Same As) 2021-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2439