NY A02438 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on October 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-23 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-23 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to tax billing addresses.
Title
Relates to tax billing addresses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-23 | Senate | tabled |
2017-10-23 | Senate | vetoed memo.157 |
2017-10-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.796 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5400A |
2017-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.471 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.471 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | print number 2438a |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2017-01-20 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S05400 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2438A